SALISBURY AND SOUTH WILTS DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities under taken by the Salisbury & South Wilts District Scout Council is to promote Scouting to young people between the ages of 6 - 25 as per the Scout Association's Policy and Rules. To also monitor the Scout Groups within the Salisbury & South Wilts District Area and report any problems to Wiltshire County Scout Council, Scout Assocation and /or Charity Commission.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 09 October 1963: Standard registration
- SALISBURY AND SOUTH WILTS BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER DEMAIN-GRIFFITHS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Clive Barrington Lewis | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Beswick | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Hume Jack | Trustee | 05 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Leonard Waspe | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Mike Hiley | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER JAMES HANDFORD | Trustee | 09 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN NEIL WYETH | Trustee | 09 June 2018 |
|
|||||
IVOR WILLIAM DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEANA COOK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.31k | £85.69k | £131.68k | £141.67k | £134.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.10k | £63.31k | £82.10k | £155.79k | £121.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 204 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 204 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCES DATED 1ST DECEMBER 1938, 11TH JULY 1939, 13TH OCTOBER 1943, 1KTH JULY 1948, 1ST MAY 1954, UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1935
Charitable objects
SALISBURY AND SOUTH WILTSHIRE BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
SALISBURY AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 MARKAN ROAD
IDMISTON
SALISBURY
SP4 0AY
- Phone:
- 01980610539
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window