Financial history 23RD SALISBURY (ST FRANCIS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £34.22k £13.34k £46.74k £53.77k £38.10k
Total expenditure £44.45k £11.59k £29.87k £72.66k £39.13k
Income from government contracts £600 N/A N/A £2.50k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £2.50k £2.50k £2.50k