ENGLISH SCHOOLS CRICKET ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a National Organisation with fourty two affilliated county associations who run and organise schools cricket, we offer National competions at under 11, 12, 13, 14 and 15. We are also involved in County and the National Bunbury under 15 Festival, we work closely with the England and Wales Cricket Board and co-operate with them in delivering cricket.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
3000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 August 1977: Standard registration
- E S C A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Giles Ashman | Chair | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Anthony Blackburn | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Wilks | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Aston | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Sillett | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WEITZEL | Trustee |
|
||||||
DENNIS HOUGHTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRIS TWORT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.36k | £2.05k | £13.26k | £59.54k | £55.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.98k | £6.48k | £48.22k | £71.39k | £59.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 1948 as amended on 12 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
The mental, moral and physical development of pupils through the medium of Cricket and the improvement of the standard of Cricket for all pupils throughout the country.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 TUDOR COURT
BEVERLEY ROAD
WILLERBY
HULL
HU10 6BF
- Phone:
- 01482671102
- Email:
- ken.lake@aelm.karoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window