Financial history THE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 306008
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.29k £12.84k £21.65k £4.20k £4.47k
Total expenditure £1.58k £3.38k £12.91k £9.49k £8.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £19.98k N/A N/A