THE GALPIN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Galpin Society was founded in 1946 to promote the study of musical instruments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 June 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Gabriele Rossi Rognoni | Chair | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karen Loomis | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sabine Klaus | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cassandre Balosso-Bardin | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Waters | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Owen Francis Woods MA Cantab | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Rachael Durkin | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alice Little | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr ARNOLD MYERS | Trustee | 28 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MIMI S WAITZMAN | Trustee | 24 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
DIANA SIMONE WELLS | Trustee |
|
||||||
DR BRADLEY STRAUCHEN-SCHERER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.06k | £23.75k | £24.95k | £30.50k | £27.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.16k | £25.83k | £26.79k | £26.61k | £32.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
(FOUNDED 1946) RULES DATED APRIL 1973
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF THE HISTORY, CONSTRUCTION AND FUNCTIONS OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS. 2. TO FURTHER RESEARCH BY THE PUBLICATION OF A JOURNAL. 3. TO PROPAGATE KNOWLEDGE OF INSTRUMENTAL HISTORY BY ANY OTHER MEANS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Dolcey Way
Sharnbrook
BEDFORD
MK44 1LE
- Phone:
- 07510254106
- Email:
- admin@galpinsociety.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window