Governing document GIRLS VENTURE CORPS AIR CADETS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28TH DECEMBER 1949 AND AMENDED 28TH FEBRUARY 1950, 21ST MAY 1965, 19TH OCTOBER 1969, 18TH MAY 1980, 16TH MAY 1981 AND 19 SEPTEMBER 1999. NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16/08/2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO PROVIDE TRAINING FOR GIRLS UP TO 18 YEARS OF AGE SO AS TO EQUIP THEM IN CHARACTER MIND AND BODY TO BECOME RESPONSIBLE SELF-DISCIPLINED CITIZENS GIVING SERVICE TO THE COMMUNITY THROUGH THEIR HOME LIFE, THEIR WORK AND THEIR LEISURE ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.