THE DOCKLAND SETTLEMENTS

Charity Number: 306025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To establish, administer and carry on community centres in london and elsewhere in the UK. Those centres are to provide facilities for recreation and all types of physical, mental, moral, educational and cultural training in order to improve the lives of the neighbourhood's residents.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Newham
  • Southwark
  • Tower Hamlets

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 August 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • DOCKLAND SETTLEMENTS (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MONTAGUE JOHN MEYER Chair
CRANLEIGH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Shalini Sharma Trustee 09 December 2019
None on record
Philip Elson Trustee 20 November 2017
None on record
Curt Fahndrich Trustee 14 May 2014
The Carpenters' and Dockland Community Centre
Received: On time
Martin Young Trustee 09 January 2013
The Carpenters' and Dockland Community Centre
Received: On time
THE MUDCHUTE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
TOWER HAMLETS COMMUNITY TRANSPORT
Received: On time
THE ATTLEE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
TRACEY ANNE CUNNINGHAM Trustee 09 January 2013
None on record
ALAN GEORGE STEAD FCA Trustee
None on record
MARK PATRICK SEEBOLD HORN BENG MSC Trustee
The Carpenters' and Dockland Community Centre
Received: On time
GRACE WILLIMOTT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £665.40k £755.63k £744.62k £839.54k £798.41k
Total expenditure £776.73k £721.02k £783.80k £955.76k £1.08m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £68.18k £47.67k £42.75k £80.20k
Income - Donations and legacies £82.67k £217.21k £123.29k £162.66k £179.93k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £477.42k £0 £0 £593.06k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £577.22k £608.33k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £336.30k £61.00k £44.11k £68.56k £25.42k
Income - Other £246.43k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £738.02k £720.02k £782.22k £941.56k £1.06m
Expenditure - Raising funds £38.71k £999 £1.58k £14.20k £16.34k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £5.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £592.43k £2.49m £575.48k £602.32k £552.52k
Long-term investments £30 £565.98k £2.49m £2.19m £2.06m
Other assets £2.30m £128.56k £93.55k £50.61k £79.81k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £51.97k £37.79k £82.01k £63.90k £43.87k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 10 FEBRUARY 1927
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP AND ORGANIZE SOCIAL SERVICE AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, PHYSICAL, MENTAL, MORAL AND CULTURAL TRAINING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 20 August 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
The Dockland Settlements
98 Gibbins Road
LONDON
E15 2HU
Phone:
02085344121