WEST END GREAT SYNAGOGUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of regular Sabbath and other religious services in advancement of Orthodox Jewish Religion. The area of operation is in and around London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 24 June 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HARVEY LAWRENCE | Chair | 25 October 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Sir Michael Pepper | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|||||||
David Feldman | Trustee | 28 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN LONDON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.46k | £80.15k | £46.10k | £42.76k | £47.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £231.98k | £33.57k | £161.06k | £39.73k | £55.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LAWS ADOPTED 14TH MARCH 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 23/06/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING REGULAR SABBATH AND OTHER RELIGIOUS SERVICES AT WHICH THE FORM OF WORSHIP AND RELIGIOUS OBSERVANCES SHALL BE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLISH OR GERMAN RITUAL LAID DOWN FOR ORTHODOX SYNAGOGUES BY THE CHIEF RABBI OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE COMMONWEALTH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
West End Great Synagogue
36-40 Hallam Street
LONDON
W1W 6NW
- Phone:
- 020 7637 1313
- Email:
- wegs@clara.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window