INTERNATIONAL YOUTH HOSTEL FEDERATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
YOUTH TOURISM, OUTDOOR EDUCATION AND RECREATION AND ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION. VIA ITS WHOLLY OWNED CHARITY, HOSTELLING INTERNATIONAL, THE FEDERATION PROVIDES INTERNATIONAL MARKETING AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY SUPPORT TO ALL YOUTH HOSTEL ASSOCIATIONS, A GLOBAL ONLINE BOOKING SERVICE AT WWW.HIHOSTELS.COM, MONITORS HOSTEL STANDARDS AND OFFERS INTERNATIONAL TRAINING FOR VARIOUS ASPECTS OF HOSTELLING
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 30 October 1970: Standard registration
- HOSTELLING INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicole Marie Sandoval | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Miguel Perestrello | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Hussain Ali Alhababi | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Abdusalam El Elarabi Abuehmaera | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Sanni Helena Viirto | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Alan Bourne | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Uwe Boehm | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Sergio Montoya Ruiz De Angelo | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephan Kurmann | Trustee | 03 September 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 November 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 January 2021 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED IN AUGUST 1970, AS AMENDED JUNE 1986, JUNE 1992, AND JULY 2004, ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 20 DECEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF ALL YOUNG PEOPLE OF ALL NATIONS, BUT ESPECIALLY YOUNG PEOPLE OF LIMITED MEANS, BY ENCOURAGING IN THEM A GREATER KNOWLEDGE, LOVE AND CARE OF THE COUNTRYSIDE AND AN APPRECIATION OF THE CULTURAL VALUES OF TOWNS AND CITIES IN ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD, AND AS ANCILLARY THERETO TO PROVIDE HOSTELS OR OTHER ACCOMMODATION IN WHICH THERE SHALL BE NO DISTINCTIONS OF RACE, NATIONALITY, COLOUR RELIGION, SEX, CLASS OR POLITICAL OPINIONS AND THEREBY TO DEVELOP A BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF THEIR FELLOW MEN BOTH AT HOME AND ABROAD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
International Youth Hostel
Federation
7 Bell Yard
London
WC2A 2JR
- Phone:
- +44 7545641612
- Email:
- info@hihostels.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window