JAMIA MASJID GULSHAN-E-BAGHDAD MOSQUE COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the Muslim faith by the following means:- 1) Providing and maintaining places of public worship and the due performance of the rites of burial according to the principles of the Muslim faith. 2) Teaching and educating the members of the Muslim community the practices of the Muslim faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 29 December 1997: Standard registration
- PAKISTAN MOSQUE COMMITTEE OF 97 FORD END ROAD, BEDFORD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Irfan Khan | Chair | 02 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Imtiaz Hussain | Trustee | 02 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ibrar Kazmi | Trustee | 02 August 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £352.68k | £129.66k | £365.44k | £604.48k | £460.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £321.33k | £130.53k | £364.73k | £343.61k | £392.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £592.63k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.85k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £343.61k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 July 2024 | 265 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
22 July 2024 | 265 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 May 2023 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 May 2023 | 183 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 March 2022 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 March 2022 | 145 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE RESIDENTS OF BEDFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FOR THE RESIDENTS OF BEDFORD AND SURROUNDING AREAS (3) THE ADVANCEMENT AND OBSERVATION OF THE BELIEFS OF AHL. E. SUNNAT WAL JAMAAT (BRAILVI) ONLY.
Area of benefit
BEDFORD AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
1-7 Westbourne Road
BEDFORD
MK40 4LB
- Phone:
- 01234351770
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window