THE NORTH OF ENGLAND ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 306077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To develop a substantial, expanding role in the conservation of global biodiversity and habitat enrichments and to support this through sustainable commercial activities, including managing Chester Zoo as a world class visitor attraction. Further details can be obtained via our Annual Report for 2021.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £57,388,000
Total expenditure: £57,711,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire West & Chester

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 December 2013: Standard registration
  • 29 January 2015: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ACT FOR WILDLIFE (Working name)
  • CHESTER ZOO (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MALCOLM ARDRON Chair 18 December 2013
None on record
Dr Gareth Edward Thomas Trustee 05 July 2024
None on record
Dr Vikas Shah Trustee 05 July 2024
None on record
Angela Bridie Robinson DL Trustee 15 June 2023
None on record
Neill Jonathan Skinner Trustee 15 June 2023
None on record
Dr Simon Cripps Trustee 15 June 2023
None on record
Yvonne Emmett Cannell Trustee 15 June 2023
None on record
Dr Romain Pizzi Trustee 08 July 2022
BRITISH AND IRISH ASSOCIATION OF ZOOS AND AQUARIUMS
Received: On time
Professor Rhys Edward Green Trustee 04 March 2022
None on record
David Wootton CBE Trustee 04 March 2022
CHESHIRE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION LIMITED
Received: On time
Jen Carter Trustee 25 June 2019
None on record
Lee Rawlinson Trustee 25 June 2019
None on record
Professor David MacDonald Trustee 09 April 2018
None on record
PENNY COATES Trustee 27 June 2017
None on record
PROFESSOR RICHARD GRIFFITHS Trustee 06 November 2015
THE HERPETOLOGICAL CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
AMPHIBIAN AND REPTILE CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
Simon Venables Trustee 24 June 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £55.15m £36.10m £45.23m £50.68m £57.39m
Total expenditure £44.38m £36.01m £44.28m £49.25m £57.71m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £15.40k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.33m £1.15m £292.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.11m £7.35m £2.49m £3.57m N/A
Income - Other trading activities £12.70m £6.37m £12.20m £14.02m N/A
Income - Charitable activities £30.62m £20.69m £30.51m £33.02m N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £26.00k £14.00k £23.00k £67.00k N/A
Income - Other £7.69m £1.68m £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £249.51k £103.00k £0 £966.00k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £31.34m £28.39m £20.77m £24.66m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.15m £7.61m £21.18m £24.59m N/A
Expenditure - Governance £910.00k £730.00k £706.00k £1.11m N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.04m £609.00k £858.00k £858.00k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £891.00k £0 £2.33m £0 N/A

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £69.58m £70.11m £65.28m £64.91m N/A
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Other assets £13.56m £7.51m £7.68m £9.33m N/A
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Total liabilities £21.72m £16.12m £10.52m £10.36m N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 JUL 2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITYS OBJECTS ARE: (A) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY PROMOTING BIODIVERSITY; AND (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON THE CONSERVATION OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL WORLD AND THE PROMOTION OF BIODIVERSITY; (C) IN PARTICULAR BY BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC EDUCATION, SCIENTIFIC STUDY AND THE MAINTENANCE OF ENDANGERED ANIMALS, PLANTS AND HABITATS IN BOTH PROTECTIVE AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENTS.
Area of benefit
Registration history
  • 06 December 2013 : Standard registration
  • 29 January 2015 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
THE NORTH OF ENGLAND ZOOLOGICAL
SOCIETY
CEDAR HOUSE
CHESTER ZOO
CAUGHALL ROAD
CH2 1LH
Phone:
01244650201