THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION TRUST CORPORATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To act as Custodian Trustee and hold title to land on behalf of and for the benefit of The Scout Association or any Scout Unit formed under the Regulations of The Scout Association and recognised thereby.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 May 1964: Standard registration
- 08 July 2021: Funds received from 1054931 1ST CALVER SCOUT GROUP
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aidan Jones | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
IAN DONALD MACKENZIE | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Debra Lisa Morris | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|||||
PETER ROSS GILKS | Trustee | 07 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY DAVID LYALL | Trustee | 07 December 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 JAN 1935 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 AUG 1967 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 JAN 1978 as amended on 03 Jul 2024 as amended on 03 Jul 2024 as amended on 03 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
“The objects of the Corporation are to further the charitable purposes of The Scout Association and in particular but without limitation to undertake, accept, execute, perform and administer any trusts or conditions affecting lands, buildings, hereditaments, investments, funds or other property whatsoever held or owned in trust or for the benefit or for any of the purposes or objects of The Scout Association or any branch thereof group or Scout Council established according to the regulations of The Scout Association and recognised thereby.”
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
GILWELL PARK
LONDON
E4 7QW
- Phone:
- 02084337178
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window