Trustees THE SCOUT AND GUIDE GRADUATE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 306103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philippa Iainne Berresford Chair 20 March 2021
None on record
Harriet Bell Trustee 15 March 2025
None on record
Nathan Reeves Trustee 15 March 2025
None on record
Leigh Brooks Trustee 15 March 2025
None on record
Rebecca Knight Trustee 16 March 2024
None on record
Dr Stephen Brown Trustee 16 March 2024
None on record
Alexander Moore Trustee 11 March 2023
None on record
Timothy David Rodaway Trustee 11 March 2023
None on record
Kara-Jane Senior Trustee 12 March 2022
None on record