THE TORCH TROPHY TRUST

Charity Number: 306115
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE TRUST AWARDS BURSARIES TO VOLUNTEERS WORKING IN SPORT AND RELATED OUTDOOR ACTIVITIES WITHIN LOCAL COMMUNITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO INCREASE THEIR KNOWLEDGE AND THEIR ABILITY TO HELP OTHERS BY TAKING COURSES TO QUALIFY AS CLUB COACHES OR OFFICIALS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018

Total income: £14,004
Total expenditure: £13,203

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 August 1977: Standard registration
  • 15 May 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 15 May 2019: Funds transferred to 1168093 BRITISH BLIND SPORT
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £16.75k £16.67k £14.44k £15.87k £14.00k
Total expenditure £23.95k £18.88k £24.50k £10.37k £13.20k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 February 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 August 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 July 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 02 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 07 June 2016 On Time