UPWARD BOUND TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The support of young people in the sport of gliding, helping them to go solo, gain their licence and gaining further certificates, as defined by the British Gliding Association.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 15 July 1965: Standard registration
- UBT (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ANGUS GALBRAITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL ALAN CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICK WATKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID SEATON BRAMWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER JAMES CONCANNON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.97k | £17.90k | £9.38k | £9.71k | £3.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.43k | £9.65k | £17.18k | £11.56k | £3.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9TH JUNE 1965
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION AND CHARACTER TRAINING OF YOUTH - BOYS AND GIRLS BETWEEN THE AGES OF 16 AND 21 - BY TRAINING IN THEORY AND IN PRACTICE IN THE ART AND SCIENE OF AERONAUTICS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 CHILTON ROAD
LONG CRENDON
AYLESBURY
HP18 9BU
- Phone:
- 01844208407
- Email:
- secretary@ubt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window