WOODLARKS CAMP SITE TRUST

Charity number: 306148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the charity is:- a) in the interest of social welfare, to improve the condition of life for disabled people and children in need b) to benefit such persons in any charitable way as the Trustees may decide.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £163,228
Total expenditure: £203,887

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 October 1964: Standard registration
  • 22 July 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
  • 22 July 2010: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WOODLARKS CAMPSITE TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lynne Cooper MBE Chair 20 August 2018
None on record
David Charles Gill Trustee 04 December 2024
None on record
Graham Thomas Curtis Trustee 30 October 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £163.29k £274.10k £326.12k £415.30k £163.23k
Total expenditure £178.36k £172.19k £233.60k £233.25k £203.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 18 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 18 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 11 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 11 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 30 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 30 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 04 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 04 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 17 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 17 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST OF 16 JUNE 1931, DECLARATION OF TRUST AND CONVEYANCE OF 10 MARCH 1938 AND DECLARATION OF TRUST OF 10 MARCH 1938.
Charitable objects
A CAMPING SPORTS AND RECREATION GROUND FOR POOR CHILDREN OR GENERALLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR CHILDREN IN ANY MANNER TO WHICH THE TRUSTEES MAY SEEM PROPER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 28 October 1964 : Standard registration
  • 22 July 2010 : Removed
  • 22 July 2010 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
Woodlarks Camp Site
Tilford Road
Lower Bourne
FARNHAM
Surrey
GU10 3RN
Phone:
01252716279