Governing document AQUATERRA LEISURE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/09/1970 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/04/1971 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 JAN 2019 as amended on 14 Jan 2019 as amended on 13 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
11 THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND FOR PERSONS WHO BY YOUTH AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES MAY HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES, 2 THE PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OR STUDENTS IN SCHOOLS OR ESTABLISHMENTS FOR FURTHER OR HIGHER EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT INCLUDING GAMES OR SPORTS EQUIPMENT COURSES LECTURES DEMONSTRATIONS AND COACHING; 3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE: 3.1 THROUGH COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, AND 3.2 BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, ADVICE AND GUIDANCE IN THE ADVANTAGES OF HEALTHY AND ACTIVE LIFESTYLES, INCLUDING THE BENEFITS OF A BALANCED AND HEALTHY DIET, AND 3.3 BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND SERVICES FOR PHYSICAL EXERCISE, TREATMENT AND ADVICE, 4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH: 4.1 THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF MUSEUMS, 4.2 THE PROVISION OF AN ARCHIVE SERVICE INCLUDING THE COLLECTION AND PRESERVATION OF DOCUMENTS AND OTHER RECORDS, 4.3 HE PROMOTION OF THE PERFORMING ARTS, THEATRICAL PRODUCTIONS AND ARTISTIC EXCELLENCE AND THE PROVISION AND OPERATION OF A THEATRE, THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF LENDING AND REFERENCE LIBRARY SERVICES EITHER FREE OR AT A REASONABLE CHARGE."
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF ISLINGTON AND ELSEWHERE THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.