THOMAS WILLIAMS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Managing financial investments with the joint aims of maintaining/increasing their value in real terms, whilst generating a level of income appropriate to the forecasted needs of beneficiaries. Publicising the existence and purpose of the Trust; soliciting applications for assistance; making awards annually to qualifying individuals and organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dorset
Governance
- 01 March 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAJOR MICHAEL JOHN ASHLEY BOND | Chair |
|
||||||
Gloria Bridget Curtis | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
The Rev Canon Richard Charles Bartlett | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN CHEESEMAN | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JOHN MUNNINGS | Trustee | 18 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND AUDLEY EDWARD WILMOT WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW CHARLES KENT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.20k | £8.39k | £10.53k | £9.66k | £8.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.96k | £8.55k | £13.05k | £6.18k | £10.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 8 APRIL 1994 as amended on 05 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
1) IN PAYING A YEARLY SUM OF ú300 OR SUCH OTHER SUM AS THE COMMISSIONERS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME APPROVE TO THE VICAR OF BERE REGIS TO BE APPLIED BY HIM AS TRUSTEE ION THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND. 2) IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE, OR WHOSE PARENTS, ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING:- A) IN AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, OR OTHER INSITUTION OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION APPROVED FOR THE PURPOSE BY THE TRUSTEES; B) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSIDSTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF, OR TO PREPARE FOR OR ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE OR SERVICE ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BERE REGIS
Contact information
- Address:
-
94 North Street
Bere Regis
WAREHAM
Dorset
BH20 7LD
- Phone:
- 07957 823234
- Email:
- office@williamstrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window