QUEEN ELIZABETH'S SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity makes grants to both individual students at Queen Elizabeth's School, Wimborne as well as grants to school projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dorset
Governance
- 17 January 1964: Standard registration
- QUEEN ELIZABETH'S SCHOOL WIMBORNE MINSTER (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ROBERT STEELE | Chair | 11 June 1998 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
ROSALIND PAMELA BROWN JENSEN | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
LARS WILLIAM JACKSON | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
CANON ANDREW JOHN WILLIAMS ROWLAND | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
ANDREW JOHN MEYRICK WORTH | Trustee | 15 June 2010 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
KEITH EDWIN NEWMAN | Trustee | 19 November 2002 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Muriel Mary Jacobs | Trustee | 11 June 1998 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.23k | £6.89k | £6.89k | £4.54k | £6.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.50k | £500 | £500 | £10.50k | £6.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 05 March 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 08 March 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 11 JUNE 1998. AS AMENDED ON 30/10/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR THE SCHOOL AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL AND PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO HAVE PREVIOUSLY BEEN PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Shakespeare Road
Wimborne
BH21 1NZ
- Phone:
- 01202 989573
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window