MONKTON WYLD SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An Education Centre for Sustainable Living, open to people of all ages and backgrounds. Monkton Wyld Court provides residential and day courses and training in low impact, low carbon living and land based skills. Our resident community leads by example, making conscious choices to live a sustainable lifestyle. We also operate as an educational venue for a wide range of groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 01 July 1967: Standard registration
- 22 November 1994: Removed
- MONKTON WYLD COURT (Working name)
- MONKTON WYLDE SCHOOL LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Juliet Hall | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Roy Evans | Trustee | 15 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lovelace Johnstone | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Ann Lovelace Johnstone | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
JANICE FREEBORN | Trustee | 28 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £166.21k | £84.13k | £145.04k | £191.81k | £121.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.21k | £88.22k | £172.54k | £150.96k | £172.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/05/1940 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/07/1964 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/12/2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 01/12/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/12/2013
Charitable objects
A) PROMOTING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WAYS OF LIVING SUSTAINABLY, USING METHODS THAT RESPECT THE LIMITS OF THE PLANET'S ENVIRONMENT, RESOURCES AND BIODIVERSITY B) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUSTAINABLE LIVING C) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT D) TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF DORSET AND THE NATION AT LARGE THE BUILDINGS OF SPECIAL ARCHITECTURAL AND HISTORIC INTEREST KNOWN AS MONKTON WYLD COURT IN THE COUNTY OF DORSET
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 01 July 1967 : Standard registration
- 22 November 1994 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
MONKTON WYLD COURT
MONKTON WYLD
BRIDPORT
DT6 6DQ
- Phone:
- 01297560342
- Email:
- info@monktonwyldcourt.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window