PORT REGIS SCHOOL LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The School which is a boarding and day preparatory school, for both boys and girls, exists to provide children between the ages of three and thirteen with an all-round education of the very highest quality. The school continues to prepare children for Common Entrance and Senior Independent School Scholarships and to ensure that each child has a full extra-curricular programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£6,977,337
Donations and legacies | £5.00k | |
Charitable activities | £6.19m | |
Other trading activities | £276.54k | |
Investments | £27.58k | |
Other | £473.34k |
Total expenditure:
£7,030,704
Raising funds | £134.49k | |
Charitable activities | £6.90m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £134.49k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.90m |
People

139 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 September 1963: Standard registration
- 14 July 1994: Removed
- PORT REGIS (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Arthur Hussey | Chair | 05 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christa Jane Band | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Snow | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Cotton | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Guy Thomas | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Frances Hattersley | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Timothy Herbert Jones | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
SOPHIE JACQUELINE O'KEEFE | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Balfour Henshilwood | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Timothy Deiniol Walker-Jones | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Giles Richard Collingridge Morant | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emily Boswell | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
FIONA ELISABETH LOVERIDGE | Trustee | 06 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gavin White | Trustee | 28 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.76m | £6.02m | £6.22m | £6.57m | £6.98m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.82m | £6.21m | £6.16m | £6.77m | £7.03m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £591.49k | £353.07k | £1.02k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £140 | £61.72k | £79.09k | £61.12k | £5.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £510.93k | £129.79k | £46.42k | £330.39k | £276.54k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.62m | £4.78m | £5.36m | £5.74m | £6.19m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.71k | £2.75k | £532 | £1.35k | £27.58k | |
|
Income - Other | £618.67k | £1.04m | £739.33k | £438.74k | £473.34k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.71m | £6.14m | £6.10m | £6.68m | £6.90m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £107.47k | £75.25k | £53.02k | £87.56k | £134.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £8.29m | £8.28m | £8.19m | £8.21m | £7.95m | |
|
Long-term investments | £5.75k | £5.75k | £5.75k | £5.75k | £5.75k | |
|
Other assets | £1.48m | £2.75m | £2.93m | £2.23m | £2.92m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.05m | £3.50m | £3.52m | £3.05m | £3.52m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 8 AUGUST 1947 AS AMENDED ON 30 MARCH 1950, 22 MARCH 1999 AND 19 JUNE 2009 as amended on 06 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO CARRY ON AND DEVELOP PORT REGIS SCHOOL, NEAR SHAFTESBURY, DORSET, OR ANY OTHER SCHOOLS, COLLEGES, NURSERIES, OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WHERE THEY MAY OBTAIN A SOUND GENERAL EDUCATION OF THE HIGHEST ORDER ON MODERN LINES AND TO PURSUE OTHER ANCILLARY EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
DORSET
Linked charities
- 04 September 1963 : Standard registration
- 14 July 1994 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
PORT REGIS SCHOOL
MOTCOMBE
SHAFTESBURY
SP7 9QA
- Phone:
- 01747857885
- Email:
- office@portregis.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window