Accounts and annual returns SHERBORNE MUSEUM ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 306251
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 March 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 11 October 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 28 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 28 April 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2014 23 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 23 July 2015 On Time