THE BATTLE AND DISTRICT HISTORICAL SOCIETY MUSEUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Static Displays: Prehistory to WW2 Special Yearly Exhibitions Curriculum led educational work School visits and hands-on educational activities. Open activity days.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £600 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 03 November 1967: Standard registration
- 11 November 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 11 November 2024: Funds transferred to 1204264 THE BATTLE MUSEUM OF LOCAL HISTORY TRUST
- BATTLE MUSEUM OF LOCAL HISTORY (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.83k | £19.25k | £12.82k | £12.60k | £19.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.25k | £13.98k | £7.24k | £8.61k | £18.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £600 | £1.56k | £11.10k | £8.60k | £600 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DEED DATED 29TH AUGUST 1967
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN A MUSEUM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC TO HOUSE COLLECTIONS WHICH PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE IN THE NATURAL SCIENCES, ARCHAEOLOGY, HISTORICAL RESEARCH AND KINDRED SUBJECTS ESPECIALLY IN RELATION TO THE VILLAGE AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
VILLAGE OF BATTLE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window