Accounts and annual returns VINCENT LINES MEMORIAL TRUST ICW HASTINGS COLLEGE OF ARTS AND TECHNOLOGY.

Charity number: 306382
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2007 06 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2006 08 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 Not Required