SARAH ROBINSON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the training/education of youngsters over school leaving age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Sussex
Governance
- 22 September 1972: Standard registration
- 11 July 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2004 | 31/01/2005 | 31/01/2006 | 31/01/2007 | 31/01/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94 | £92 | £92 | £99 | £100 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £500 | £600 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2008 | 28 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 16TH DECMBER 1955, AS AMENDED BY A SCHEME DATED 21ST AUGUST 1972
Charitable objects
AFTER PAYMENT OF ANY EXPENSES OF ADMINSTRATION THE NET INCOME OF THE FOUNDATION SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES IN ANY OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDRE RESIDENT IN THE URBAN DISTRICT OF CRAWLEY WHO, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES, ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE:- (A) EXHIBITION TENABLE AT NAY SECONDARY SCHOOL, TRAINING COLLEGE FOT TEACHERS, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER INSTIUTION OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHINICAL) EDUCATION, APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES, TO BE AWARDED UNDER RULES TO BE MADE BY THE TRUSTEES, INCLUDING RULES AS TO THE VALUE AND PERIOD OF TENURE OF THE EXHIBITIONS, AND THE QUALIFICATIONS AND METHODS OF ASCERTAINMENT AND SELECTION, OF CANDIDATES; (B) FINANCIAL ASSITANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRMENTS OR BOOKS TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVRSITY OR ANY OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT, TO PREPARE FOR, OR TO ASSIST THEIR ENTRY INTO, A PROFESSION, TADE OR CALLING; (C) OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OR BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
CRAWLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window