1)JANE DOWNER 2)HOOPER'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the education of persons under 25 years of age who, or whose parents, reside in the Deanery of Storrington, preference being given to residents of the parish of Storrington.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- West Sussex
Governance
- 30 July 1963: Standard registration
- HOOPER AND DOWNER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (Working name)
- HOOPER'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- JANE DOWNER (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JONATHAN REID SWINDELLS | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS CHOATE | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
DENNIS ALAN COWDREY | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER DENIS MACE | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Richard Carter | Trustee | 07 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Raymond Butler | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.79k | £24.57k | £32.79k | £34.55k | £37.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.42k | £26.36k | £29.95k | £38.10k | £32.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 8TH OCTOBER 1980
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO,OR WHOSE PARENTS,RESIDE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT ,PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO PERSONS QUALIFIED AS AFORESAID IN THE PARISH OF STORRINGTON. THE EXPRESSION "AREA OF BENEFIT" SHALL MEAN THE AREA CONSISTING OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES OF AMBERLEY WITH STOKE,ASHINGTON WITH BUNCTON,ASHURST,BRAMBER WITH ST BOTOLPHS,COLDWALTHAM,GREATHAM,HARDHAM,PARHAM,PULBOROUGH,STEYNING,STORRINGTON,SULLINGTON,THAKEHAM WITH WARMINGHURST,UPPER BEEDING,WASHINGTON,WEST CHILTINGTON,WIGGONHOLT AND WISTON,ALL IN THE COUNTY OF WEST SUSSEX
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 The Heights
WORTHING
West Sussex
BN14 0AL
- Phone:
- 01903260803
- Email:
- jrsac2223@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window