WILLIAM OLDER'S SCHOOL CHARITY

Charity number: 306424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity's activities are focused on the children & young people of the parish of Angmering, West Sussex.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £28,458
Total expenditure: £26,124

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 March 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MARGARET BUTCHER CHRISTMAS FUND (Previous name)
  • WILLIAM OLDER'S FOUNDATION (INCLUDING THE SMART AUGMENTATION FUND) (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ann Jones Trustee 01 July 2019
THE AUBREY FLETCHER RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
James Nicholl Trustee 01 January 2017
THE AUBREY FLETCHER RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
REVEREND MARK STANDEN Trustee 01 January 2013
None on record
Peter John Gayler Trustee
None on record
RICHARD LIGHTFOOT HOBDEN Trustee
CHENGELO EDUCATIONAL TRUST (UK)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £18.28k £17.71k £26.96k £28.00k £28.46k
Total expenditure £10.02k £27.27k £9.96k £26.41k £26.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 28 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 28 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 December 2023 43 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 16 NOVEMBER 1977
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF CHRISTMAS ENTERTAINMENTS FOR FURTHERING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF ST MARGARET'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL AT ANGMERING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 19 March 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
PARISH OFFICE
St MARGARETS CHURCH
ARUNDEL ROAD
ANGMERING
LITTLEHAMPTON
BN16 4JS
Phone:
01903 784459
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available