TYWARDREATH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a parish hall for use by the inhabitants of the area of benefit for:- advancing the education including the social and physical training of persons under 25 years of age; other more general use:- meetings, lectures and classes, and other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 14 January 1964: Standard registration
- NATIONAL SCHOOL (Working name)
- OLD NATIONAL SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT LEWIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Peter James Milbank | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catriona Elizabeth Smith | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Pemberton | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Tippett | Trustee | 19 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY RICHARDS | Trustee | 19 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
EVELYN ROSS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID HAKSTEEG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE BLAKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIR RICHARD HARRY RASHLEIGH BT. | Trustee |
|
||||||
LINDA HAKSTEEG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR WARREN-NICHOLLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL BLAKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.67k | £2.36k | £4.75k | £7.61k | £10.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.83k | £14.08k | £2.68k | £3.50k | £7.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 10 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
(1) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT INCLUDING THE SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF PERSONS UNDER 25 YEARS OF AGE; AND (2) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, SEX, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
TWYARDREATH AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 CHURCH STREET
TYWARDREATH
PAR
PL24 2QG
- Phone:
- 01726815008
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window