KENNERLY TRUST

Charity Number: 306547
Charity reporting is up to date (82 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

provision of social housing

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £22,532
Total expenditure: £14,655

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 February 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR P J WHITFORD Chair
None on record
Helene Aston Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
ALAN DAVID JANUARY Trustee 28 May 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £22.36k £22.19k £22.19k £21.84k £22.53k
Total expenditure £14.65k £24.67k £14.35k £13.80k £14.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 January 2025 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 January 2025 448 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 November 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 November 2021 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 November 2021 390 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 Kennerley Terrace
St. Mawes
TRURO
Cornwall
TR2 5AX
Phone:
01326270041
Website:

No information available