THE SHUTTLEWORTH MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a hall for use by the inhabitants of the are of benefit for all or any of the following purposes: 1 a sunday school or classes for religious instruction in accordance with the doctrines of the church of england; 2 eve0001ning or other classes for instruction in secular subjects or lectures of an educational character; 3 physical and mental recreation with the objec
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 20 April 1964: Standard registration
- EGLOSHAYLE VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- SHUTTLEWORTH MEMORIAL HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Davey | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel John Davey | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.80k | £3.80k | £850 | £9.52k | £10.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.63k | £1.20k | £570 | £7.60k | £6.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 April 2021 | 169 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 6 FEBRUARY 2001
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE ARE OF BENEFIT FOR ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: 1 A SUNDAY SCHOOL OR CLASSES FOR RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND; 2 EVENING OR OTHER CLASSES FOR INSTRUCTION IN SECULAR SUBJECTS OR LECTURES OF AN EDUCATIONAL CHARACTER; 3 PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS; 4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY MEANS OF A LIBRARY OR READING ROOM; 6 IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 BY THE PROVISION (IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE) OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS TO ENABLE THEM TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND MORAL CAPACITIES THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF EGLOSHAYLE, WADEBRIDGE AND ST BREOCK AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Riverside
Sladesbridge
WADEBRIDGE
Cornwall
PL27 6JB
- Phone:
- 07977128251
- Email:
- egloshall@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window