SIR JAMES SMITH'S FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial help towards cost of school trips and school uniform. Prize Money Awards
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cornwall
Governance
- 23 June 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kristien Carrington | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.07k | £457 | £480 | £912 | £1.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.33k | £340 | £1.14k | £404 | £1.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 3RD FEBRUARY 1964
Charitable objects
1. PROVIDING SPECIAL BENEFITS FOR THE CAMELFORD SIR JAMES SMITH'S SCHOOL. 2. AWARDING EXHIBITIONS FOR HIGHER EDUCATION TO BOYS AND GIRLS ATTENDING OR HAVING ATTEDNED THE CAMELFORD SIR JAMES SMITH'S SCHOOL AND BEING IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. 3. PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO PREPARE FOR OR TO ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING. 4. OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING, OF BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF LANTEGLOS BY CAMELFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O LINDA MACLEOD
DARK LANE
CAMELFORD
CORNWALL
PL32 9UJ
- Phone:
- 01840213274
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window