FOWEY GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to advance the education of children and young people in the area of benefit. Financial assistance is given to both Fowey Primary School & Fowey River Academy (previously Fowey Community College) and individual students under the age of 25 who qualify for awards in the form of annual bursaries and grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cornwall
Governance
- 24 April 1963: Standard registration
- FOWEY GRAMMAR SCHOOL EXHIBITION FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS JAMES STEPHENS | Chair | 12 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
LEANNE OSBORNE | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
ALEXANDER ROBERT MCKAY MBE | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
ELIZABETH MEASOM | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Thomas McLean | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
ELIZABETH HENDRY | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
LUCY PEMBERTON | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
ANDREW JOHN STAMPFORD HARVEY | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
BENJAMIN MATTHEW EDDY | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony William Freshwater | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
PHILIP DE GREY-WARTER | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.98k | £85.88k | £90.77k | £94.41k | £97.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.24k | £86.10k | £83.29k | £78.25k | £75.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 March 2024 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 March 2024 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 16 MAY 2007 as amended on 07 Jan 2025 as amended on 07 Jan 2025 as amended on 07 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
1) PROVIDING FOR ANY MAINTAINED SCHOOL IN THE PARISH OF FOWEY SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE TRUSTEES AND THE GOVERNORS OF THE SCHOOL CONCERNED 2) PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER 25 WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT OR WHO ARE ABOUT TO ATTEND, ARE ATTENDING OR HAVE FOR NOT LESS THAN THREE YEARS AT ANY TIME ATTENDED A MAINTAINED SCHOOL IN THE PARISH OF FOWEY AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE BY: A) AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION APPROVED FOR THE PURPOSE BY THE TRUSTEES; B) PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS) TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF, OR TO PREPARE FOR OR ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. NB THE AREA OF BENEFIT IS THE CIVIL PARISHES OF FOWEY, TYWARDREATH, ST SAMPSON AND LANTEGLOS AND THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BLAZEE
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 VICARAGE ROAD
TYWARDREATH
PAR
PL24 2PQ
- Phone:
- 01726812285
- Email:
- fgsclerk@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window