Accounts and annual returns ST PETROC'S SCHOOL TRUST LTD

Charity number: 306578
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 316 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 316 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 July 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 04 July 2022 4 days late
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 15 June 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 04 June 2020 On Time