Governing document TRURO CATHEDRAL SCHOOL LIMITED
Charity number: 306582

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 21 NOVEMBER 1960,AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21 MARCH 1985 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 24 MARCH 1982, 19 JUNE 1984 AND AMENDED ON THE 26TH JUNE 1995.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE INDEPENDENT EDUCATION FOR BOYS, GIRLS AND STUDENTS ATTENDING THE SCHOOLS IN THE DIOCESE OF TRURO IN WHICH INSTRUCTION IS GIVEN I.A.W. THE DOCTRINES OF THE C OF E AND/OR CHURCHES IN COMMUNION THEREWITH.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
DIOCESE OF TRURO
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.