BUNGAY GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the education of children and young people between the ages of 11 and 18 years who attend Bungay High School at any time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 09 November 1998: Standard registration
- BUNGAY GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dan Keates | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Crickmore | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chanel Oswick | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Anne van Dijk | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Ann Douglas | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Stella Margaret Mackenzie | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLARE HELEN SEPPINGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN TODD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.19k | £10.30k | £25.07k | £10.15k | £15.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.00k | £8.89k | £13.39k | £23.16k | £12.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 February 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 21/07/1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20/4/15
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 11 AND 18 YEARS WHO ATTEND BUNGAY HIGH SCHOOL AT ANY TIME. (2) IF AND SO FAR AS THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE OBJECT SPECIFIED IN SUB -CLAUSE (1) ABOVE, THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY IT IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 11 AND 18 YEARS WHO ATTEND OTHER SCHOOLS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
BUNGAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bungay High School (FAO C Seppings)
Queens Road
BUNGAY
Suffolk
NR35 1RW
- Phone:
- 01508518197
- Email:
- mail@bungayhigh.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window