ST LUKES COLLEGE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 306606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Makes grants to individuals for university level studies in theology and religious education, and provides resources to universities for these subjects.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £239,862
Total expenditure: £1,118,922

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 September 1962: Standard registration
  • 05 January 1996: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Georgina Margaret Radford Chair 24 November 2019
DEVON COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETROC'S SOUTH BRENT
Recently registered
LITTLE HEMPSTON PARISH LANDS
Received: On time
PARISH LANDS
Received: On time
The Rt Revd Dr Michael Robert Harrison Trustee 18 November 2024
THE POSBURY ST FRANCIS TRUST
Received: On time
BISHOP OF EXETER'S CLERGY FUND
Received: On time
THE EXETER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE EXETER DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN DEVON
Received: On time
LEE MOSCATO Trustee 17 June 2024
ASKEL VEUR THE DIOCESE OF TRURO ACADEMIES UMBRELLA COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
Rev Robert Charles Evans Trustee 01 March 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. KEVERNE
Received: On time
Linda Rudge Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Professor Louise Joy Lawrence Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Professor Timothy Quine Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Susan Mary Lockwood Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
THE VERY REVEREND JONATHAN DESMOND FRANCIS GREENER Trustee 01 December 2017
EXETER CATHEDRAL MUSIC FOUNDATION (CIO)
Recently registered
DEAN BOYD'S CHARITY FOR APPRENTICING
Received: On time
PHILLPOTTS AND BOYD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BISHOP PHILPOTTS' AND DEAN BOYD'S CHURCH ENDOWMENT FUNDS
Received: On time
REVEREND CHANCELLOR HARINGTON FOR CHORISTERS OF EXETER CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
BOYD FOR EXHIBITIONS
Received: On time
THE MARY MARRIOTT TRUST
Received: On time
REYNOLDS WHALE TRUST FOR ORDINANDS
Received: On time
THE CARYLL WENBORN TRUST FUND
Received: On time
DEAN AND CHAPTER OF EXETER CATHEDRAL SCHOOL PRIZE FUND
Received: On time
THE EXETER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Venerable Dr Trevor Pryce Jones Trustee 20 June 2017
THE POSBURY ST FRANCIS TRUST
Received: On time
GILES RICHARD FRAMPTON Trustee 01 January 2016
THE EXETER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE POSBURY ST FRANCIS TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £226.69k £212.94k £220.57k £344.14k £239.86k
Total expenditure £231.08k £223.93k £203.44k £262.62k £1.12m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 14 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 14 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 22 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 22 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 30 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 30 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 02 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 02 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 10 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 10 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT EXETER DISTRICT REGISTRY ON 2 AUGUST 1881.
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED EQUALLY BETWEEN ST. LUKES COLLEGE FOUNDATION AND THE LECTURER IN THEOLOGY AND ECCLESIASTICAL HISTORY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 14 September 1962 : Standard registration
  • 05 January 1996 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
The Vicarage
School Hill
Stoke Gabriel
TOTNES
Devon
TQ9 6QX
Phone:
01803782031