DYKE EXHIBITION FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 306610
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Foundation makes awards to students who are undertaking courses in Further Education. The awards are made to assist with fees, accommodation, purchase of books and equipment, or any other expense incurred by the student. Applicants must be resident in Somerset, Devon or Cornwall.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2018

Total income: £2,422
Total expenditure: £5,299

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall
  • Devon
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 October 1962: Standard registration
  • 09 December 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 03 October 2011: Re-registered
  • 24 January 2020: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 24 January 2020: Funds transferred to 1094446 SOMERSET COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018
Total gross income £6.37k £4.63k £3.53k £2.94k £2.42k
Total expenditure £2.75k £2.83k £3.48k £5.34k £5.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2018 11 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 12 June 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 25 April 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required