THE CITY OF LONDON CORPORATION COMBINED RELIEF OF POVERTY CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of those in need by reason of poverty, old age, ill health, accident or infirmity who are either the widow, widower or child of a Freemen of the City of London or the London Boroughs by the provision of grants, items and services or such other support as the Trustee determines.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- City Of London
Governance
- 29 January 1999: Standard registration
- 09 June 2011: Funds received from 206932 SIR JOHN PHILPOT'S CHARITY
- 09 June 2011: Funds received from 206934 MARY WILKES'S CHARITY
- 09 September 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 30 October 2012: Re-registered
- 08 April 2019: Funds received from 206643 CORPORATION OF LONDON BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION
- 18 May 2020: Funds received from 206949 SIGNOR FAVALE'S MARRIAGE PORTION CHARITY
- THE JENNER BEQUEST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CITY OF LONDON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.94k | £18.68k | £23.13k | £9.09k | £18.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £417 | £19.96k | £66.36k | £86.02k | £3.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 09/06/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF POVERTY, OLD-AGE, ILL-HEALTH, ACCIDENT OR INFIRMITY WHO ARE EITHER THE WIDOW, WIDOWER OR CHILD OF A FREEMAN OF THE CITY OF LONDON OR WHO RESIDE IN THE CITY OF LONDON OR THE LONDON BOROUGHS BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES OR SUCH OTHER SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEE DETERMINES.
Area of benefit
CITY OF LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
CITY OF LONDON CORPORATION
PO BOX 270
GUILDHALL
LONDON
EC2P 2EJ
- Phone:
- 02073321917
- Email:
- Grants@cityoflondon.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window