Accounts and annual returns BRIXHAM HERITAGE MUSEUM & HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 306633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 25 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 25 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 20 June 2024 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 18 September 2024 226 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 05 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 05 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 30 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 30 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 14 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 14 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window