THE BUDLEIGH SALTERTON ARTS CENTRE AND MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The establishment and maintenance of an arts centre and museum for the benefit of the inhabitants of the beneficial area and visitors thereto.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £4,680 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 28 March 1968: Standard registration
- FAIRLYNCH - MUSEUM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR WADDINGTON | Chair | 03 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Linden Harris | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hazell | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Denis Bernard Hadley | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Ian Nigel Lacey PhD | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Rosalind Margaret Hickman | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christine Fry | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.83k | £26.16k | £63.76k | £24.90k | £24.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.92k | £22.53k | £59.29k | £33.62k | £62.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £400 | £11.83k | £9.21k | N/A | £4.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13TH MARCH 1968
Charitable objects
THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ARTS CENTRE AND MUSEUM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA AND VISITORS THERETO.
Area of benefit
BUDLEIGH SALTERTON AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fairlynch Museum & Arts Centre
27 Fore Street
BUDLEIGH SALTERTON
EX9 6NP
- Phone:
- 01395442666
- Email:
- info@fairlynchmuseum.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window