FRIENDS OF EXETER MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the Exeter Museums Service in many ways, both practically and financially
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 15 August 1972: Standard registration
- 09 November 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 09 November 2023: Funds transferred to 1196908 THE FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL ALBERT MEMORIAL MUSEUM AN...
- F E M A G (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF THE EXETER MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERY TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.34k | £14.50k | £53.15k | £35.97k | £22.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.98k | £14.84k | £7.41k | £742 | £1.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23RD DECEMBER 1971, AS AMENDED 21ST JULY 1976,10TH JULY 1980 AND 15TH JULY 1992
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF KNOWLEDGE IN MUSEUMS, ART GALLERIES, BUILDINGS OR PLACES OF ARTISTIC HISTORIC OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST.
Area of benefit
CITY OF EXETER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window