HOLMES AND CORRIE PRIZES FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GRANTS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES, PRIZES OR OTHER BENEFITS FOR BOYS AND GIRLS WHO ARE ATTENDING, OR WHO HAVE FOR NOT LESS THAN 2 YEARS PRIOR TO AN AWARD ATTENDED COUNTY OR VOLUNTARY SCHOOLS IN THE CITY OF PLYMOUTH, AND WHO HAVE OBTAINED THE BEST RESULTS IN GCSE AND A LEVELS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 19 February 1976: Standard registration
- 06 September 2011: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 06 September 2011: Funds transferred to 1137876 PLYMOUTH ASPIRATIONS TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155 | £165 | £185 | £187 | £167 | |
|
Total expenditure | £129 | £129 | £136 | £170 | £160 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 22 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 10 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 24 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 19 FEBRUARY 1976.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN PLYMOUTH IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT. 1) AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS OR SUCH OTHER ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. 2) PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC, OTHER ARTS OR SPORT) TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATION ESTABLISHMENT.
Area of benefit
CITY OF PLYMOUTH.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window