GEORGE WILLIAM EYRE SCHOLARSHIP

Charity Number: 306678
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

INCOME TO BE APPLIED FOR A SCHOLARSHIP TO BE AWARDED ALTERNATIVELY TO A BOY OR GIRL FOR SUCH PERIOD AND SUCH PURPOSES AND CONDITIONS AS THE PLYMOUTH EDUCATION AUTHORITY SHALL DETERMINE.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010

Total income: £455
Total expenditure: £480

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Plymouth City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 September 1962: Standard registration
  • 06 September 2011: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 06 September 2011: Funds transferred to 1137876 PLYMOUTH ASPIRATIONS TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £419 £444 £500 £503 £455
Total expenditure £378 £396 £438 £450 £480
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 22 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 10 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 16 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required