Accounts and annual returns DEVON MASONIC EDUCATIONAL FUND
Charity number: 306693
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2009 | 07 April 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2008 | 07 August 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2008 | 20 August 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 November 2007 | 20 October 2008 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2007 | 18 July 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 November 2006 | 03 October 2007 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2006 | 26 September 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 November 2005 | 31 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2005 | 31 July 2006 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window