SIR HENRY PEEK'S BEQUEST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN THE COMBINED PARISH OF COMBPYNE-ROUSDON, INCLUDING THE AWARD OF GRANTS TO LOCAL YOUNG PEOPLE INVOLVED IN CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 05 May 1964: Standard registration
- 12 June 2023: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5 | £8 | £4 | £1 | £14 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £40 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 13 MAY 1898 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 20 FEBRUARY 1986 AND BY RESOLUTION OF THE TRUSTEES UNDER SECTION 74(D) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 DATED 21 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROVISION WITHIN THE PARISH OF ROUSDON ST PANCRAS OF RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND BY MEANS OF A SUNDAY SCHOOL OR OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF ROUSDON, COMBPYNE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window