THE MAYNARD SCHOOL TRUST
Charity Number: 306726
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2004
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
Registration history:
Organisation type:
Other names:
- MAYNARD'S GIRLS' SCHOOL (Previous name)
- THE MAYNARD SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 08 JANUARY 2004
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO PROVIDE AND CONDUCT IN OR NEAR EXETER A DAY OR DAY AND BOARDING SCHOOL FOR GIRLS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
IN OR NEAR EXETER, DEVON
Linked charities
Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31 DECEMBER 1976
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE GIRLS STUDYING LATIN, GREEK, MODERN LANGUAGES OR MUSIC TO FURTHER THEIR EDUCATION BY THE PURCHASE OF BOOKS, TRAVEL, ATTENDING A COURSE ETC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 08 July 1966 : Standard registration
- 13 July 2004 : Removed
- 13 July 2004 : Asset transfer out
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window