ST DUNSTAN'S ABBEY SCHOOL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing premises for Education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 01 October 1964: Standard registration
- 12 March 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 12 March 2024: Funds transferred to 1105544 PLYMOUTH COLLEGE AND ST DUNSTAN'S ABBEY SCHOOLS CH...
- ST DUNSTAN'S ABBEY SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.64k | £484 | £353 | £32 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.08k | £2.50k | £2.50k | £438.35k | £3.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 August 2020 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 2 SEPTEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 06 SEP 2022 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 30 MAR 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN EFFECT, IN OR NEAR TO THE CITY OF PLYMOUTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window