BROADMEAD'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is set up to help young people of Woodbury Parish. It does this by donating money to organisations which provide facilities for the children and young people in the parish of Woodbury
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 10 August 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Patrick Browne | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137 | £140 | £144 | £144 | £152 | |
|
Total expenditure | £240 | £0 | £280 | £300 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 26 AUGUST 1873
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS BY MEANS OF A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS:- PROVISION OF FREE PLACES AND PRIZES, EXHIBITIONS FOR FURTHER EDUCATION, PROVISION OF A SCHOOL LENDING LIBRARY AND ADDITIONAL FACILITIES FOR SCHOOLS.
Area of benefit
WOODBURY AND THE HAMLET OF EXTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 ESCOT COTTAGES
BROADWAY
WOODBURY
EXETER
EX5 1NT
- Phone:
- 01395232805
- Email:
- RUTHANDPATB@AOL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window