MARY DEAN'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides funding to Mary Dean's school to a budget set each year by the Trustees. Grants to former pupils of the school who are undertaking further/higher education or need sponsorship for a recognised activity to an amount set by the Trustees. All applications are discussed by the Trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 16 August 1962: Standard registration
- MARY DEAN'S CHARITY (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Gerda van Ommeren | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Stockman | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSANNE BURNETT | Trustee | 16 July 1998 |
|
|
||||
MR STAN STODDARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS S GRIER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOANNE ELIZABETH PARKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.49k | £5.61k | £47.46k | £5.11k | £5.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.20k | £1.16k | £7.07k | £833 | £16.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2024 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 November 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 November 2022 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 March 2021 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1670 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 11TH SEPTEMBER 1874 AS AMENDED BY A SCHEME OF THE 7TH AUGUST 1978
Charitable objects
TO GIVE A SOUND AND PRACTICAL EDUCATION TO BOYS AND GIRLS, BY MEANS OF A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS, ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OR THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TAMERTON FELIOT
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 ASHLEIGH CLOSE
TAMERTON FOLIOT
PLYMOUTH
PL5 4PY
- Phone:
- 01752791587
- Email:
- sburnett25@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window