Governing document GEORGE LEY EDUCATIONAL

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 6 AUGUST 1874 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17 MAY 1904 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10 MAR 1905 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 JUN 2018 AS AMENDED ON 09 OCT 2018 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 JAN 2020
Charitable objects
ADVANCE EDUCATION BY: (A) AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION; (B) PROVIDING FUNDING TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS) OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT, INCLUDING APPRENTICESHIPS; AND (C) FUNDING EDUCATIONAL PROJECTS OR EQUIPMENT REQUIRED BY COMBE MARTIN PRIMARY SCHOOL THAT THEY WOULD OTHERWISE NOT BE ABLE TO AFFORD.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF COMBE MARTIN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.